LA SB16 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 1/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 1/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a special prestige license plate to bear the international symbol of accessibility and one for "Upside Downs". (1/1/19) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides for a special prestige license plate to bear the international symbol of accessibility and one for "Upside Downs". (1/1/19) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 16 CONCUR (#1039) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on SB 16 FINAL PASSAGE (#806) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 16 FINAL PASSAGE (#104) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on SB 16 FINAL PASSAGE (#806) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 16 FINAL PASSAGE (#104) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2019. |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 346. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18. |
2018-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |