LA SB156 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 48-3)
Status: Vetoed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Notice House failed to override the Governor's veto.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the Fairness in Women's Sports Act relative to a school's ability to offer opportunities to each student to participate in team sporting events on an equal basis. (8/1/21) (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the Fairness in Women's Sports Act relative to a school's ability to offer opportunities to each student to participate in team sporting events on an equal basis. (8/1/21) (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-21 - House - House Vote on SB 156 PREVIOUS QUESTION (#4) (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-07-21 - House - House Vote on SB 156 PASS BILL SUBSEQUENT TO VETO (#7) (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-07-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 156 PASS SUBSEQUENT TO VETO (#2) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 156 FINAL PASSAGE (#772) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 156 FINAL PASSAGE (#772) (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 156 FINAL PASSAGE (#274) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21SenateNotice House failed to override the Governor's veto.
2021-07-21HouseBy a vote of 68 yeas and 30 nays, the House failed to override the Governor's veto.
2021-07-21HouseReconsidered.
2021-07-20HouseNotice Senate voted to override the Governor's veto
2021-07-20SenateBy a vote of 26 yeas and 12 nays, the Senate voted to override the Governor's veto.
2021-07-20SenateReconsidered.
2021-07-20SenateRules suspended.
2021-07-20SenateVeto message from the Governor received and read.
2021-06-21SenateVetoed by the Governor.
2021-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2021-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-01SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2021-05-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 19. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
2021-05-18HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-17HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-13HouseReported favorably (10-4). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-05-06HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-05SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-04SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-03SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-04-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB156&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210805
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219263
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221516
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229694
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219246
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218672
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1210807
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213114
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220794
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220985
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221028
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221685
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222280
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231737
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236636
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1238115
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221490
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229157
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229606
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237615
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237652
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237649

Bill Comments

feedback