LA SB154 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the authority of the commissioner of insurance to require fingerprints of applicants for licenses and certificates of authority. (gov sig)
Title
Provide for the authority of the commissioner of insurance to require fingerprints of applicants for licenses and certificates of authority. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 154 CONCUR (#639) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 154 FINAL PASSAGE (#519) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 154 FINAL PASSAGE (#134) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 154 FINAL PASSAGE (#519) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 154 FINAL PASSAGE (#134) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | Effective date 6/23/2015. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 162. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2015-05-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/26/2015. |
2015-05-14 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-04-30 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2015-04-29 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |