LA SB153 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Deferred involuntarily
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to sports wagering. (See Act) (RE1 +$1,225,000 SD EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to sports wagering. (See Act) (RE1 +$1,225,000 SD EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 153 REFER TO LEGISLATIVE BUREAU (#981) (Y: 41 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 153 REFER TO LEGISLATIVE BUREAU (#599) (Y: 49 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 153 REFER TO LEGISLATIVE BUREAU (#599) (Y: 48 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 153 FINAL PASSAGE (#186) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28HouseDeferred involuntarily
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-21HouseReported with amendments (11-6). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-05-01HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-30SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 15 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-30SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2019-04-29SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-04-24SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-23SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB153&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120915
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126494
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129351
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126410
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127304
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129076
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128707
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136446
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135703
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135441
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135413
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137747
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138136
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137748
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137566
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141944
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142386
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138220
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120916
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127311
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129432
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133433
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136440
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137718
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129271
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138387
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138604
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142657

Bill Comments

feedback