LA SB153 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removes certain provisions regarding prosecution of the possession of a firearm with obliterated, removed, changed or altered number or mark which were declared unconstitutional. (8/1/16)
Title
Removes certain provisions regarding prosecution of the possession of a firearm with obliterated, removed, changed or altered number or mark which were declared unconstitutional. (8/1/16)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - House - House Vote on SB 153 FINAL PASSAGE (#941) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 153 FINAL PASSAGE (#206) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 153 FINAL PASSAGE (#206) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2016. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 340. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-05-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-05-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-19 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2016. |
2016-05-17 | House | Notice given. |
2016-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2016. |
2016-05-09 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-05 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-04-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |