LA SB149 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
Pending: House Civil Law and Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
Pending: House Civil Law and Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for delictual actions. (8/1/22)
Title
Provides for delictual actions. (8/1/22)
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 149 FINAL PASSAGE (#225) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-04-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 4 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |