LA SB149 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the state of Louisiana to sell or transfer certain state property. (8/1/19) (EN INCREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the state of Louisiana to sell or transfer certain state property. (8/1/19) (EN INCREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 149 CONCUR (#926) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 149 FINAL PASSAGE (#867) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 149 FINAL PASSAGE (#128) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateEffective date 6/11/2019.
2019-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 272.
2019-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-05SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-06-03SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-06-03HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-06-02HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-06-02HouseReported favorably (19-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-21HouseReported with amendments (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2019-04-25HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-24SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-23SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-22SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB149&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120898
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125999
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127254
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142566
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144033
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125928
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127120
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126949
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136194
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134197
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133218
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137744
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136560
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141743
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141740
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142214
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120899
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125646
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126717
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126968
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127352
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129796
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136143
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142973
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127188
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141880
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142293

Bill Comments

feedback