LA SB148 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Waterway Dredging and Deepening Priorty Program. (7/1/17) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Waterway Dredging and Deepening Priorty Program. (7/1/17) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 148 CONCUR (#928) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 148 REJECT (#876) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#740) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#178) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 148 REJECT (#876) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#740) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#178) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2017. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 382. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017. |
2017-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members discharged. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee members discharged. |
2017-06-07 | House | Discharged from Conference Committee. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Dwight, Havard, and Bishop. |
2017-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2017-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Chabert, LaFleur, and Johns. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-05 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-23 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-05-03 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |