LA SB147 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Effective date 8/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Effective date 8/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the release of a body for disposition by a coroner.
Title
Provides for the release of a body for disposition by a coroner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 147 FINAL PASSAGE (#522) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 147 FINAL PASSAGE (#101) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 147 FINAL PASSAGE (#101) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2020. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 114. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-05-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0.. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-21 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |