LA SB147 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for charter schools to pay a proportionate share of the local school district's of Teachers' Retirement System UAL payment. (6/30/16) (OR INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides for charter schools to pay a proportionate share of the local school district's of Teachers' Retirement System UAL payment. (6/30/16) (OR INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Gatti [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Education. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |