LA SB147 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to changes in the Agricultural Commodity Dealer and Warehouse Law. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to changes in the Agricultural Commodity Dealer and Warehouse Law. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Long [R] | Sen. Ben Nevers [D] | Rep. Neil Riser [R] | Rep. Francis Thompson [R] |
Sen. Michael Walsworth [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 147, CONCUR (#1615) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 147, FINAL PASSAGE (#1371) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 147, FINAL PASSAGE (#118) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 147, FINAL PASSAGE (#1371) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 147, FINAL PASSAGE (#118) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date 6/30/10. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 767. | |
2010-06-17 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-15 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-11 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2010. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2010-06-02 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-27 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-04-13 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | |
2010-04-12 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-12 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-12 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-08 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-07 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | |
2010-03-16 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |