LA SB146 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits public adjuster from acting as an appraiser or umpire pursuant to appraisal if he is adjusting or has adjusted all or part of a claim or property subject to appraisal. (8/1/12)
Title
Prohibits public adjuster from acting as an appraiser or umpire pursuant to appraisal if he is adjusting or has adjusted all or part of a claim or property subject to appraisal. (8/1/12)
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Long [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 146, CONCUR (#1154) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 146, FINAL PASSAGE (#960) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 146, FINAL PASSAGE (#89) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 146, FINAL PASSAGE (#960) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 146, FINAL PASSAGE (#89) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-05-25 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 309. | |
2012-05-23 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-22 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-22 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-21 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-05-17 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/17/2012. | |
2012-05-07 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-03 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-02 | Reported favorably (9-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-03-28 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2012-03-27 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-03-26 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-03-21 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-03-20 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2012-02-27 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |