LA SB145 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date 6/20/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to human trafficking. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to human trafficking. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 145 CONCUR (#523) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 145 FINAL PASSAGE (#594) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 145 CO-AUTHORS (#158) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 145 FINAL PASSAGE (#157) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateEffective date 6/20/2019.
2019-06-20SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 409.
2019-05-30SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-05-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-29SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-28SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-05-23HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
2019-05-16HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-15HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-14HouseReported with amendments (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-04-30HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-04-29HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-29SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-25SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-24SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB145&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120852
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127184
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138500
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144796
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127068
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133657
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133848
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137612
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120854
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127659
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133846
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135844
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138995
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145124
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128615
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128616
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137468
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138341

Bill Comments

feedback