LA SB144 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for renewal of certain sales tax exemption certificates. (1/1/14) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for renewal of certain sales tax exemption certificates. (1/1/14) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 144 FINAL PASSAGE (#557) (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 144 FINAL PASSAGE (#238) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 144 FINAL PASSAGE (#238) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2014. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 93. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 22, 2013. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (15-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-05-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |