LA SB143 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the concealed carrying of firearms. (8/1/22) (EN DECREASE SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the concealed carrying of firearms. (8/1/22) (EN DECREASE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. John Morris [R] | Sen. Stewart Cathey [R] | Sen. Louie Bernard [R] | Rep. Francis Thompson [R] |
Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 143 CONCUR (#1266) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 143 FINAL PASSAGE (#1408) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 143 FINAL PASSAGE (#485) (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 143 FINAL PASSAGE (#1408) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 143 FINAL PASSAGE (#485) (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2022. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 680. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2022. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-19 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-05-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |