LA SB143 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designates LA Hwy. 118 from Florien to Kisatchie the "Louisiana Maneuvers Highway". (8/15/10)
Title
Designates LA Hwy. 118 from Florien to Kisatchie the "Louisiana Maneuvers Highway". (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Rep. Elton Aubert [D] | Rep. Herbert Dixon [D] | Rep. Jean Doerge [D] | Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D] |
Rep. John Guinn [R] | Rep. Dorothy Hill [D] | Sen. Gerald Long [R] | Rep. Jack Montoucet [D] |
Rep. Karen St Germain [D] |
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 143, FINAL PASSAGE (#879) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 143, FINAL PASSAGE (#285) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 143, FINAL PASSAGE (#285) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-05-26 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 15. | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-18 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-18 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-05-17 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 17, 2010. | |
2010-05-13 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2010-05-12 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-11 | Reported favorably (15-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-04-22 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-04-21 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-19 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2010-03-16 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |