LA SB142 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Effective date 7/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Effective date 7/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the month of July as "Sarcoma Awareness Month". (7/1/14)
Title
Designates the month of July as "Sarcoma Awareness Month". (7/1/14)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - House - House Vote on SB 142 FINAL PASSAGE (#1024) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 142 CO-AUTHORS (#299) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 142 FINAL PASSAGE (#297) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 142 CO-AUTHORS (#299) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 142 FINAL PASSAGE (#297) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2014. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 371. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-05-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2014. |
2014-05-06 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-05 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2014-04-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |