LA SB140 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain offices to report cyber incidents to secretary of state. (8/1/20)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain offices to report cyber incidents to secretary of state. (8/1/20)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-11SenateReported with amendments.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2020-02-25SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback