LA SB139 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the civil service status of employees of the Delcambre Housing Authority and the Gueydan Housing Authority. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to the civil service status of employees of the Delcambre Housing Authority and the Gueydan Housing Authority. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 139 FINAL PASSAGE (#145) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-26 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |