LA SB137 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for boundaries, board membership and tax authority of the Baton Rouge North Economic Development District and a hotel occupancy tax in East Baton Rouge Parish. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for boundaries, board membership and tax authority of the Baton Rouge North Economic Development District and a hotel occupancy tax in East Baton Rouge Parish. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 137 FINAL PASSAGE (#1256) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 137 FINAL PASSAGE (#969) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 137 FINAL PASSAGE (#969) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | Effective date 6/17/2016. |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 528. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-06-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-06-02 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-06-02 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2016-05-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |