LA SB136 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the employment of special attorneys or counsel. (gov sig) (REF DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the employment of special attorneys or counsel. (gov sig) (REF DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 136 REJECT (#1309) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 136 FINAL PASSAGE (#1212) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 136 FINAL PASSAGE (#1041) (Y: 46 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 136 FINAL PASSAGE (#319) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 136 FINAL PASSAGE (#1212) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 136 FINAL PASSAGE (#1041) (Y: 46 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 136 FINAL PASSAGE (#319) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Bishop, Henry, and Mack. |
2016-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Ward, Peterson, and LaFleur. |
2016-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2016-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-02 | House | Motion to reconsider called from the table. |
2016-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 46, nays 46. Failed to pass. |
2016-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2016. |
2016-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-17 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-05-16 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-04-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-04-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |