LA SB136 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Effective date 8/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Effective date 8/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for no dealer charge backs for rebates paid and for certain unauthorized acts by a manufacturer, wholesaler, distributor branch, factory branch, converter, or their officer, agent or other representative. (8/1/13)
Title
Provides for no dealer charge backs for rebates paid and for certain unauthorized acts by a manufacturer, wholesaler, distributor branch, factory branch, converter, or their officer, agent or other representative. (8/1/13)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 136 CONCUR (#478) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 136 FINAL PASSAGE (#468) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 136 FINAL PASSAGE (#198) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 136 FINAL PASSAGE (#468) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 136 FINAL PASSAGE (#198) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2013. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 61. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2013. |
2013-05-08 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-01 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2013-04-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |