LA SB135 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to possession of weapons and certain judicial proceedings and reports. (1/1/14) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to possession of weapons and certain judicial proceedings and reports. (1/1/14) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 135 CONCUR (#743) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 135 FINAL PASSAGE (#626) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 135 FINAL PASSAGE (#184) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 135 FINAL PASSAGE (#626) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 135 FINAL PASSAGE (#184) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2014. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 404. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013. |
2013-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-04-30 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2013-04-29 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |