LA SB132 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Effective date 6/30/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Effective date 6/30/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Re-creates the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency Preparedness. (6/30/22)
Title
Re-creates the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency Preparedness. (6/30/22)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - House - House Vote on SB 132 FINAL PASSAGE (#1089) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 132 FINAL PASSAGE (#381) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 132 FINAL PASSAGE (#381) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/30/2022. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 182. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-05-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2022. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-09 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-05 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-04-26 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |