LA SB130 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for a proposition election to determine whether sports wagering activities and operations will be permitted in a parish. (See Act)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a proposition election to determine whether sports wagering activities and operations will be permitted in a parish. (See Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#490) (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#168) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11SenateEffective date: See Act.
2020-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 215.
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2020-05-31HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-28SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-27SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2020-05-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 23. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-20HouseReported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-05-13SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 8 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-02-25SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback