LA SB130 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for an exception to the use of electronic or audio recordings by court reporters in New Orleans Civil District Court to hearings regarding protection from abuse, assault, and stalking. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for an exception to the use of electronic or audio recordings by court reporters in New Orleans Civil District Court to hearings regarding protection from abuse, assault, and stalking. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130 CONCUR (#925) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#920) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#88) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateEffective date 8/1/2019.
2019-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 270.
2019-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-05SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays.
2019-06-03SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-06-03HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseRules suspended.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-06-03HouseRules suspended.
2019-06-03HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-06-02HouseReferred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-06-02HouseRead by title, amendments adopted.
2019-06-02HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-31HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-30HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-04-23HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-22SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-17SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-16SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB130&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120447
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124756
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126093
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142542
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144031
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124749
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139599
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139148
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141675
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142085
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120448
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125603
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126170
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139632
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145120
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125993
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142044
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142288

Bill Comments 750

feedback