LA SB130 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-03 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Early Childhood Care and Education Network and the Tiered Kindergarten Readiness Improvement System. (gov sig) (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Early Childhood Care and Education Network and the Tiered Kindergarten Readiness Improvement System. (gov sig) (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130 CO-AUTHORS (#156) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#155) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-03HouseNotice removed
2013-06-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2013.
2013-06-02HouseNotice given.
2013-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2013.
2013-05-28HouseNotice given.
2013-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013.
2013-05-22HouseNotice given.
2013-05-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2013-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on May 21, 2013.
2013-05-10HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2013-05-09HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2013-05-08HouseReported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-04-29HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2013-04-25HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2013-04-24SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-04-23SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-04-22SenateReported with amendments.
2013-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2013-03-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=13rs&b=SB130&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=833987
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=840036
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841657
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839849
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=840142
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841285
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=844578
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=846294
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=846301
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=833989
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839372
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841027
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841215
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841737
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=845305
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=846850
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841608
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841609

Bill Comments 750

feedback