LA SB130 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date 5/31/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits distribution of products containing Mitragyna speciosa in minors. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits distribution of products containing Mitragyna speciosa in minors. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130, CONCUR (#1153) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 130, FINAL PASSAGE (#959) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130, CO-AUTHORS (#339) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130, FINAL PASSAGE (#338) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-31 Effective date 5/31/12.
2012-05-31 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 355.
2012-05-23 Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2012-05-22 Signed by the Speaker of the House.
2012-05-22 Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2012-05-21 Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2012-05-17 Received from the House with amendments.
2012-05-17 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2012-05-11 Scheduled for floor debate on 5/17/2012.
2012-05-07 Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2012-05-03 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2012-05-02 Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2012-04-12 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2012-04-11 Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
2012-04-10 Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2012-04-10 Called from the Calendar.
2012-03-26 Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2012-03-21 Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2012-03-20 Reported favorably.
2012-03-12 Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2012-02-27 Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback