LA SB128 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to teacher planning time and lunch periods and to provide an exemption from tolls on La. Hwy. 1 bridge for school personnel. (See Act) (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to teacher planning time and lunch periods and to provide an exemption from tolls on La. Hwy. 1 bridge for school personnel. (See Act) (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on SB 128 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1226) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 128 ADOPT (#1048) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 128 REJECT (#985) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 128 FINAL PASSAGE (#1050) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 128 FINAL PASSAGE (#466) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 128 CO-AUTHOR SB 128 BY JACKSON (#467) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17SenateEffective date: See Act.
2021-06-17SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 392.
2021-06-10SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-10SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-10SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-10HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2021-06-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/10/2021.
2021-06-09HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2021-06-09HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-09SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 3 nays.
2021-06-09SenateRules suspended.
2021-06-09HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-09SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Jackson, Fields, and Mizell.
2021-06-09SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-06-09HouseHouse conferees appointed: Jefferson, Wright, and Mincey.
2021-06-08HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2021-06-08SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-07SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-06-07HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021.
2021-06-03HouseRead by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-06-03HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-06-02HouseReported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-27HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-05-26HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-25SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-24SenateRead by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
2021-05-18SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2021-05-17SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-03-31SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB128&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1209863
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224694
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228187
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234513
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235881
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224629
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224506
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224048
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227860
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232496
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1209864
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216494
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225829
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227076
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228220
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228849
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233078
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233117
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233998
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234658
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234839
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235908
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228163
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228164
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232785
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233219
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234032
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234418

Bill Comments

feedback