LA SB124 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Effective date 6/28/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the Ouachita Parish Police Jury to prohibit certain roadside sales of animals. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Ouachita Parish Police Jury to prohibit certain roadside sales of animals. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-16 - House - House Vote on SB 124, FINAL PASSAGE (#687) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 124, SB 124 BY WALSWORTH (#216) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-28 Effective date 6/28/11.
2011-06-28 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 306.
2011-06-21 Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2011-06-19 Signed by the Speaker of the House.
2011-06-19 Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2011-06-19 Received from the House without amendments.
2011-06-16 Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2011-06-15 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2011.
2011-06-15 Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2011-06-14 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2011-06-13 Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2011-05-19 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2011-05-18 Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
2011-05-18 Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2011-05-17 Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
2011-05-16 Reported with amendments.
2011-04-25 Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2011-04-14 Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback