LA SB124 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a refund of an overpayment of state tax or local sales tax for any payment for any period if a claim for refund is received between June 30, 2010 and January 1, 2011. (7/1/10) (OR DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes a refund of an overpayment of state tax or local sales tax for any payment for any period if a claim for refund is received between June 30, 2010 and January 1, 2011. (7/1/10) (OR DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Read by title; withdrawn from the files of the Senate. | |
2010-04-26 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2010-03-16 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=SB124 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=685489 |