LA SB121 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to terminology of court-ordered and other mandatory examinations in civil and administrative matters and claims. (gov sig) (EGF NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to terminology of court-ordered and other mandatory examinations in civil and administrative matters and claims. (gov sig) (EGF NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 121 CONCUR (#874) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 121 FINAL PASSAGE (#759) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 121 FINAL PASSAGE (#303) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 121 FINAL PASSAGE (#759) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 121 FINAL PASSAGE (#303) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | Senate | Effective date 6/23/2017. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 381. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-06-05 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported with amendments (5-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |