LA SB12 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for qualifications of the city of Jennings deputy chief of police. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for qualifications of the city of Jennings deputy chief of police. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 12 FINAL PASSAGE (#579) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 12 FINAL PASSAGE (#197) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
2019-05-13HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-09HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-08HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-05-02HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-01SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-30SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-29SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2019-02-21SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback