LA SB119 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-25 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-25 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to limit the number of constitutional amendments that may appear on a ballot. (2/3-CA13s1(A))
Title
Constitutional amendment to limit the number of constitutional amendments that may appear on a ballot. (2/3-CA13s1(A))
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |