LA SB119 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Effective date 5/16/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the licensure and regulation of certain farm-raised exotic animals. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the licensure and regulation of certain farm-raised exotic animals. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-30 - House - House Vote on SB 119 FINAL PASSAGE (#684) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 119 FINAL PASSAGE (#78) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-16SenateEffective date 5/16/2014.
2014-05-16SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 110.
2014-05-07SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2014-05-06HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2014-05-05SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2014-05-05SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2014-04-30HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2014-04-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2014.
2014-04-16HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-04-15HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2014-04-14HouseReported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2014-03-26HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2014-03-25HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2014-03-24SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2014-03-19SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2014-03-18SenateReported favorably.
2014-03-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2014-02-25SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=14rs&b=SB119&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=875264
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=883100
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=885082
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=899453
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=905773
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=883579
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=875270
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=883782
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=885152
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=905841
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=885001
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=899057

Bill Comments

feedback