LA SB119 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Effective date 6/23/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Effective date 6/23/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to leases of public lands. (6/23/11)
Title
Provides relative to leases of public lands. (6/23/11)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 119, CONCUR (#850) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House Vote on SB 119, FINAL PASSAGE (#650) (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 119, FINAL PASSAGE (#313) (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House Vote on SB 119, FINAL PASSAGE (#650) (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 119, FINAL PASSAGE (#313) (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Effective date 6/23/11. | |
2011-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 335. | |
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-06-22 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-22 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-21 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays. | |
2011-06-15 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2011-06-15 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 5. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2011. | |
2011-06-13 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-08 | Reported with amendments (12-0-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-02 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2011-06-01 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-31 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-24 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-23 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Natural Resources. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Natural Resources. |