LA SB118 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the jurisdictional limits of the Winnfield City Court and Monroe City Court to $30,000 and the limit of the Baton Rouge City Court to $35,000. (8/15/10)
Title
Increases the jurisdictional limits of the Winnfield City Court and Monroe City Court to $30,000 and the limit of the Baton Rouge City Court to $35,000. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Long [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 118, CONCUR (#846) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 118, FINAL PASSAGE (#1057) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 118, FINAL PASSAGE (#103) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 118, FINAL PASSAGE (#1057) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 118, FINAL PASSAGE (#103) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 161. | |
2010-06-04 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-02 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-02 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-01 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays. | |
2010-05-27 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-05-26 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 26, 2010. | |
2010-05-18 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-17 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-13 | Reported favorably (9-0-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-04-13 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2010-04-12 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-12 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-07 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-06 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary A. | |
2010-03-15 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary A. |