LA SB117 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Agricultural Meteorology Program.
Title
Creates the Agricultural Meteorology Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 117 FINAL PASSAGE (#117) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-03-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |