LA SB116 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the office on women's health within the Louisiana Department of Health. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the office on women's health within the Louisiana Department of Health. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 116 CONCUR (#1337) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 116 FINAL PASSAGE (#1468) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 116 AMENDMENT # 5445 BY CREWS MOTION TO ADOPT (#1467) (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 116 CO-AUTHORS (#337) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 116 FINAL PASSAGE (#336) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 116 FINAL PASSAGE (#1468) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 116 AMENDMENT # 5445 BY CREWS MOTION TO ADOPT (#1467) (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 116 CO-AUTHORS (#337) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 116 FINAL PASSAGE (#336) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/18/2022. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 676. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-05 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-05-04 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |