LA SB114 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Effective date 6/2/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires approval by the governing board for any salary adjustments or cost of living adjustments for employees or board members of certain boards under the authority of the Department of Health and Hospitals and employees of certain human service districts. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires approval by the governing board for any salary adjustments or cost of living adjustments for employees or board members of certain boards under the authority of the Department of Health and Hospitals and employees of certain human service districts. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-24 - House - House Vote on SB 114 FINAL PASSAGE (#1011) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 114 FINAL PASSAGE (#214) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-02SenateEffective date 6/2/2016.
2016-06-02SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 338.
2016-05-26SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2016-05-25HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2016-05-25SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2016-05-24SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2016-05-24HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2016-05-24HouseCalled from the calendar.
2016-05-24HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2016-05-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2016.
2016-05-13HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-05-12HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2016-05-11HouseReported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2016-04-12HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2016-04-11SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-04-07SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-04-07SenateRules suspended.
2016-04-06SenateReported with amendments.
2016-03-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2016-03-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback