LA SB113 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 7, nays 86. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment to authorize limited redirection and transfer of funds supporting appropriations and allocations from the state general fund and dedicated funds in certain circumstances. (2/3 CA13s1(A)) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment to authorize limited redirection and transfer of funds supporting appropriations and allocations from the state general fund and dedicated funds in certain circumstances. (2/3 CA13s1(A)) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 113, FINAL PASSAGE (#737) (Y: 7 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 113, SB 113 BY CROWE (#218) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-20 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 7, nays 86. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2011-06-19 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
2011-06-16 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011.
2011-06-16 Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2011-06-15 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2011-06-14 Rules suspended. Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2011-06-14 Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular).
2011-05-23 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2011-05-19 Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
2011-05-18 Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2011-05-17 Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
2011-05-16 Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2011-04-25 Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Finance.
2011-04-14 Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback