LA SB112 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes sharing of prescription monitoring program information with prescription monitoring programs located in other states. (8/1/12)
Title
Authorizes sharing of prescription monitoring program information with prescription monitoring programs located in other states. (8/1/12)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 112, LOCAL AND CONSENT CALENDAR (#1042) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 112, FINAL PASSAGE (#210) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 112, FINAL PASSAGE (#210) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 352. | |
2012-05-24 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-23 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-23 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-22 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-22 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/22/2012. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2012-05-11 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-03 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-04-02 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-02 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-03-29 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-03-28 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-02-22 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |