LA SB111 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-02 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-02 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to court costs in suits involving the state and state agencies in the Nineteenth Judicial District Court. (8/1/19) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to court costs in suits involving the state and state agencies in the Nineteenth Judicial District Court. (8/1/19) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 111 FINAL PASSAGE (#277) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-02 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2019-05-29 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19. |
2019-05-21 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |