LA SB108 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to criminal bail bonds. (8/1/19)
Title
Provides relative to criminal bail bonds. (8/1/19)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 108 CONCUR (#525) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 108 FINAL PASSAGE (#597) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 108 FINAL PASSAGE (#104) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 108 FINAL PASSAGE (#597) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 108 FINAL PASSAGE (#104) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 54. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19. |
2019-05-22 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. |
2019-05-09 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-04-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2019-04-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |