LA SB108 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-02 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-02 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana Election Code. (1/1/12) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana Election Code. (1/1/12) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Riser [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 108, FINAL PASSAGE (#312) (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-06-01 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-31 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 12 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-24 | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-17 | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | |
2011-05-12 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-11 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |