LA SB107 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date 8/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the crime of possessing, trafficking, or importing a child sex doll. (8/1/24) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
Creates the crime of possessing, trafficking, or importing a child sex doll. (8/1/24) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 107 CONCUR (#1189) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 107 FINAL PASSAGE (#1293) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 107 FINAL PASSAGE (#28) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 107 FINAL PASSAGE (#1293) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 107 FINAL PASSAGE (#28) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2024. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 505. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2024-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2024. |
2024-05-20 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-15 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-05-14 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-03-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-03-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |