LA SB107 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adds post traumatic stress disorder to the list of injuries which are compensable for injured public employees. (8/1/19) (EN NO IMPACT APV)
Title
Adds post traumatic stress disorder to the list of injuries which are compensable for injured public employees. (8/1/19) (EN NO IMPACT APV)
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Gatti [R] | Sen. Wesley Bishop [D] | Sen. Troy Carter [D] | Sen. Ronnie Johns [R] |
Rep. Joseph Stagni [R] | Rep. Dodie Horton [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 107 CONCUR (#661) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 107 AMENDMENT # 3403 BY MAGEE MOTION TO ADOPT (#677) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 107 FINAL PASSAGE (#678) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 107 LIMIT DEBATE (#676) (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 107 FINAL PASSAGE (#305) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 107 AMENDMENT # 3403 BY MAGEE MOTION TO ADOPT (#677) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 107 FINAL PASSAGE (#678) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 107 LIMIT DEBATE (#676) (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 107 FINAL PASSAGE (#305) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2019. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 122. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2019-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19. |
2019-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2019-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |