LA SB106 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Effective date 5/27/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies when a short-form birth certificate card may be purchased. (gov sig) (EN +$301,038 RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies when a short-form birth certificate card may be purchased. (gov sig) (EN +$301,038 RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 106 CONCUR (#857) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 106 FINAL PASSAGE (#805) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 106 FINAL PASSAGE (#97) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-27SenateEffective date 5/27/2016.
2016-05-27SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 270.
2016-05-23SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/20/2016.
2016-05-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2016-05-19SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2016-05-18SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2016-05-17SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2016-05-16HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2016-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2016.
2016-05-09HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-05-05HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2016-05-04HouseReported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-04-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2016-03-31HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2016-03-30SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-03-30SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2016-03-29SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2016-03-23SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-03-22SenateReported favorably.
2016-03-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2016-03-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=16rs&b=SB106&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=979714
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=986384
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=988838
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1004798
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1008340
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=988124
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1000758
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1004373
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=979715
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=986057
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=987018
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=986878
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=988992
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=989953
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1005467
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1005135
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=988757
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1003784
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1004732

Bill Comments

feedback