LA SB106 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the state to allow legislators to use surplus space in a state building for a legislative office within their district. (8/1/12) (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the state to allow legislators to use surplus space in a state building for a legislative office within their district. (8/1/12) (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 106, CONCUR (#1634) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 106, FINAL PASSAGE (#1409) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 106, FINAL PASSAGE (#752) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-11 Effective date 8/1/12.
2012-06-11 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 728.
2012-06-04 Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2012-06-03 Signed by the Speaker of the House.
2012-06-03 Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2012-06-01 Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2012-05-31 Received from the House with amendments.
2012-05-31 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2012-05-24 Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012.
2012-05-24 Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2012-05-23 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2012-05-22 Reported favorably (7-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2012-05-09 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2012-05-08 Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
2012-05-07 Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2012-05-03 Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2012-05-02 Reported with amendments.
2012-03-12 Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2012-02-22 Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback