LA SB106 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the levy, collection, and use of certain taxes collected for the benefit of the Vermilion Parish Tourist Commission. (8/15/11)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the levy, collection, and use of certain taxes collected for the benefit of the Vermilion Parish Tourist Commission. (8/15/11)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-20 Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
2011-06-20 Rules suspended
2011-06-19 Reported with amendments.
2011-04-25 Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2011-04-14 Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback